Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4267747 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20216530 | 22.12.2020 | WO2021EP87315 | 22.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116685197 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20216530 | 22.12.2020 | WO2021EP87315 | 22.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3201361 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20216530 | 22.12.2020 | WO2021EP87315 | 22.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021406520 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20216530 | 22.12.2020 | WO2021EP87315 | 22.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022136557 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20216530 | 22.12.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4019639 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20216530 | 22.12.2020 |