19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
16.02.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.02.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.02.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.09.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] |
29.09.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] |
23.05.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.02.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.02.2023 |
First examination report |
|
27.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
25.03.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
28.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.01.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.10.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
22.10.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.10.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
28.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
13.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
21.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|