Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022106984 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019200645 | 18.01.2019 | WO2020EP50639 | 13.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022517515 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102019200645 | 18.01.2019 | WO2020EP50639 | 13.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118208499 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202080009059 | 13.01.2020 | DE102019200645 | 18.01.2019 | WO2020EP50639 | 13.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113302415 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102019200645 | 18.01.2019 | WO2020EP50639 | 13.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3911866 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | C0 | EP3911866 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | B1 | EP3911866 | 24.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019200645 | 18.01.2019 | WO2020EP50639 | 13.01.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020148200 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019200645 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102019200645 | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019200645 | 18.01.2019 |