EP3911866 - HIGH PRECISION GEAR BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 23.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Filing of request for unitary effect | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZ, Ingo Berliner Strasse 22 97447 Gerolzhofen / DE | [2024/12] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
SCHULZ, Ingo 97447 Gerolzhofen / DE | Representative(s) | Kohl, Thomas SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 20700787.3 | 13.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020EP50639 | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 22.03.2024 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/18] | 02.04.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/18] | 02.04.2024 | Date of registration [2024/18] | 20.03.2024 | Date of legal effect [2024/18] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 02.04.2024 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/18] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3911866 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] |