EP3911560 - STORAGE CASE FOR A MOTORCYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAD, S.L. C. Octavio Lacante Pallisón, 2-6 Pol. Ind. Can Magarola 08100 Mollet del Vallès / ES | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AYALA GONZALEZ, Pedro C. Octavio Lacante Pallisón, 2-6 Pol. Ind. Can Magarola 08100 Mollet del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
AYALA GONZALEZ, Pedro 08100 Mollet del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES | Representative(s) | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P Edifici PRISMA Av. Diagonal núm. 611-613, Planta 2 08028 Barcelona / ES | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/47] | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P C. de Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 20707806.4 | 20.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020IB50414 | Priority number, date | EP20190382035 | 18.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19382035 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020148733 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911560 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3911560 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62J9/23, B62J9/24, B62J9/27, B62J9/30, A45C13/18, A45C13/10, A45C5/03 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
B62J9/27 (EP);
A45C13/10 (EP);
A45C13/18 (EP);
A45C5/03 (EP);
B62J9/23 (EP);
B62J9/24 (EP);
B62J9/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | B62J9/23, B62J9/24, B62J9/30, E05B65/52, A45C13/18, A45C13/10, A45C5/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBEWAHRUNGSKASTEN FÜR EIN MOTORRAD | [2021/47] | English: | STORAGE CASE FOR A MOTORCYCLE | [2021/47] | French: | COFFRE DE RANGEMENT POUR MOTOCYCLETTE | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 17.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE4230972 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,12-14,16,17 * column 3, line 41 - column 5, line 44 * * figures 1-7 * [A] 6,9-11,15 [I] 3; | [AD]US5439149 (WALTER HUBERT [DE], et al) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [XAI]EP0709283 (LUCIA MONFORTE PEDRO [ES]) [X] 1,2,13-17 * the whole document * [A] 4-12[I] 3; | [A]US2003150894 (FANG TIEN-CHING [TW]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0027] - [0036] * * figures 4-12 *; | [A]ITMI20090695 (GIVI SRL) [A] 1-17 * figures 1-7 * | by applicant | US5439149 | EP3121097 |