EP3814916 - PRIORITY BASED MANAGEMENT OF ACCESS TO SHARED RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mobileye Vision Technologies Ltd. 13 Hartom Street P.O. Box 45157 9372502 Jerusalem / IL | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHTER, Itamar P.O. Box 184 9983300 Nehusha / IL | 02 /
SHULMAN, Boris 21 Maklef St., Apt. 8 5867288 Holon / IL | 03 /
KERET, Galit 24 Hechalutz St. 9622215 Jerusalem / IL | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 20716636.4 | 06.03.2020 | [2021/18] | WO2020US21564 | Priority number, date | US201962815389P | 08.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962815389 P | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020185623 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3814916 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/362 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
G06F13/362 (EP,KR);
G06F9/4818 (US);
B60W60/001 (US);
G06F13/18 (KR);
G06N3/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | PRIORITÄTSBASIERTE VERWALTUNG DES ZUGRIFFS AUF GEMEINSAME RESSOURCEN | [2021/18] | English: | PRIORITY BASED MANAGEMENT OF ACCESS TO SHARED RESOURCES | [2021/18] | French: | GESTION D'ACCÈS À DES RESSOURCES PARTAGÉES BASÉE SUR LA PRIORITÉ | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 25.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003177296 (KURTH HUGH [US]); | [A]US2005165987 (ASANO SHIGEHIRO [US], et al); | [A]US2014047148 (MACE TIMOTHY CHARLES [GB]); | [A]WO2018193448 (MOBILEYE VISION TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL]) |