|
19.08.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2024 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2024 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2024 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.07.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2023 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.05.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.05.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2021 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2021 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2021 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2021 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Information regarding early processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.09.2020 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2020 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.07.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.07.2020 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
07.07.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
07.07.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.07.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
20.04.2020 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.04.2020 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.04.2020 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
01.04.2020 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
23 |
|
01.04.2020 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
01.04.2020 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |