Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3814916
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.08.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.07.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.02.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.07.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.03.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.05.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
13.05.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
18.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.01.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.01.2022 |
First examination report |
|
17.08.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.04.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
03.04.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.04.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
23.10.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
28.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
15.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|