Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11868801 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2024 | B2 | US2022291948 | 15.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962815389 | 08.03.2019 | US202016981179 | 06.03.2020 | US202217680871 | 25.02.2022 | WO2020US21564 | 06.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11275606 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2022 | B2 | US2021157634 | 27.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962815389 | 08.03.2019 | US202016981179 | 06.03.2020 | WO2020US21564 | 06.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102244556B | Global Dossier | 27.04.2021 | B1 | KR20200121903 | 26.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962815389 | 08.03.2019 | WO2020US21564 | 06.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6979139B | Global Dossier | 08.12.2021 | B2 | JP2021520585 | 19.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962815389 | 08.03.2019 | WO2020US21564 | 06.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112219197B | Global Dossier | 23.01.2024 | B | CN112219197 | 12.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962815389 | 08.03.2019 | WO2020US21564 | 06.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3814916 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962815389 | 08.03.2019 | WO2020US21564 | 06.03.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020185623 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962815389 | 08.03.2019 |