|
04.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
04.03.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
04.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2024 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.11.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.11.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2023 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2022 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2022 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.05.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
05.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2022 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2022 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2021 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.08.2021 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
319 |
|
15.10.2020 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.10.2020 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
253 |
|
17.07.2020 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
14.05.2020 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
19 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
233 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
6 |