Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3953351
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.04.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.11.2023 |
First examination report |
|
09.11.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.04.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
12.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
21.06.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.06.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
13.05.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
29.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.01.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
14.01.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
14.01.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
22.12.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2021 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
09.11.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
05.11.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.09.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
16.10.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.10.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
14.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|