EP3953351 - CONDENSED AZINES FOR EP300 OR CBP MODULATION AND INDICATIONS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Opna Bio SA Route de la Corniche 6 1066 Epalinges / CH | [2023/21] |
Former [2022/24] | For all designated states Opna Immuno Oncology, SA Route de la Corniche 6 1066 Epalinges / CH | ||
Former [2022/07] | For all designated states Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEVAK, Wayne c/o Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
BUELL, John c/o Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
GUO, Zuojun c/o Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 04 /
INAGAKI, Hiroaki c/o Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 05 /
JIN, Yongil c/o Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 06 /
PHAM, Phuongly c/o Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 07 /
SHI, Songyuan c/o Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 08 /
WALLESHAUSER, Jack c/o Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 09 /
WU, Jeffrey c/o Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 10 /
WU, Guoxian c/o Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 11 /
ZHANG, Chao c/o Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 12 /
ZHANG, Jiazhong c/o Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 13 /
ZHANG, Ying c/o Plexxikon Inc. 329 Oyster Point Blvd South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Wallace, Sheila Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20722870.1 | 08.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020US27282 | Priority number, date | US201962831622P | 09.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962831622 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020210366 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3953351 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61P35/00 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/444 (IL,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (IL,US);
A61K31/497 (IL,US);
A61K31/501 (IL,US);
A61K31/506 (IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (IL,KR,US);
A61P25/28 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D413/04 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Extension states | BA | 05.11.2021 | ME | 05.11.2021 | Title | German: | KONDENSIERTE AZINE FÜR EP300- ODER CBP-MODULATION UND INDIKATIONEN DAFÜR | [2022/07] | English: | CONDENSED AZINES FOR EP300 OR CBP MODULATION AND INDICATIONS THEREFOR | [2022/07] | French: | AZINES CONDENSÉES POUR LA MODULATION EP300 OU CBP ET INDICATIONS POUR CELLES-CI | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 05.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2009054941 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-20,22 * step 1, intermediate: 1H-Pyrrolo[2,3-b]pyridine, 5-(1-methyl-1H-pyrazol-4-yl)-1- (phenylsulfonyl)-3-(4,4,5,5-tetramethyl-1,3,2-dioxaborolan-2-yl)-;; example 1 * [I] 6,21; | [XI]WO2012129338 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-20,22 * examples 54b,54 * [I] 6,21; | [XI]WO2013075785 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-20,22 * Intermediate; page 64 * * claim - * [I] 6,21; | [XI]WO2014053568 (SANOFI SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-20,22 * stage 5, intermediate; page 119; example 14 * [I] 6,21; | [I]WO2014145051 (ZHANG JIAZHONG [US], et al) [I] 1-37 * table - * * page 97 - page 261; example - * * claim - *; | [I]WO2014154760 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE]) [I] 1-37 * example - ** claim - *; | [I]WO2017053243 (PLEXXIKON INC [US]) [I] 1-37 * page 49 - page 65; example - * * table - * * claim - *; | [I]WO2018175311 (PLEXXIKON INC [US]) [I] 1-37 * the whole document * * example - * * claim - *; | [IP]WO2019075243 (PLEXXIKON INC [US]) [IP] 1-37 * the whole document * * example - * * claim - *; | [XI] - ANU J. AIRAKSINEN ET AL, "Radiosynthesis and evaluation of new [alpha]1-adrenoceptor antagonists as PET radioligands for brain imaging", NUCLEAR MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY., US, (20130801), vol. 40, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.nucmedbio.2013.05.007, ISSN 0969-8051, pages 747 - 754, XP055712575 [X] 1-5,7-20,22-24 * figure 1 * * Scheme 1 * [I] 6,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nucmedbio.2013.05.007 | [XI] - JØRGENSEN MORTEN ET AL, "Discovery of novel [alpha]1-adrenoceptor ligands based on the antipsychotic sertindole suitable for labeling as PET ligands", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY : A TETRAHEDRON PUBLICATION FOR THE RAPID DISSEMINATION OF FULL ORIGINAL RESEARCH PAPERS AND CRITICAL REVIEWS ON BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY AND RELATED DISCIPLINES, (20121115), vol. 21, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2012.10.049, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 196 - 204, XP028961411 [X] 1-5,7-20,22-24 * table 1 * * Schemes 3,4 * [I] 6,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2012.10.049 | by applicant | US4150949 | EP0154734 | US4568649 | US4626513 | US2004077595 | - GIOTOPOULOS et al., "The epigenetic regulators CBP and p300 facilitate leukemogenesis and represent therapeutic targets in acute myeloid leukemia", Oncogene, (20160121), vol. 35, no. 3, pages 279 - 289 | - PEREZ-SALVIA et al., Bromodomain inhibitors and cancer therapy: From structures to applications, Epigenetics & Chromatin, (20180000), vol. 11, page 30 | - MULLIGHAN et al., "CREBBP mutations in relapsed acute lymphoblastic leukemia", Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, no. 7337, pages 235 - 9 | - CONERY et al., Bromodomain inhibition of the transcriptional coactivators CBP/EP300 as a therapeutic strategy to target the IRF4 network in multiple myeloma, URL: https://doi.org/10.7554/eLife.10483.001 | - MADEO et al., "Spermidine delays ageing in humans", Aging, (20180000), vol. 10, no. 8 | - GARCIA-CARPIZO et al., "CREBBP/EP300 bromodomain inhibitors in breast cancer", Mol. Cancer Res., (20190300), vol. 17, no. 3 | - BERGE, S. M. et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. Pharmaceutical Science, (19770000), vol. 66, doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - UNDENFRIEND et al., Anal. Biochem., (19870000), vol. 161, pages 494 - 500 | - J Control Release, (20151210), vol. 219, pages 396 - 405 | - BERTOLINI et al., J. Med. Chem., (19970000), vol. 40, pages 2011 - 2016 | - SHAN et al., J Pharm Sci, (19970000), vol. 86, no. 7, pages 756 - 757 | - BAGSHAWE, Drug Dev. Res., (19950000), vol. 34, pages 220 - 230 | - JERRY MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry: Reactions, Mechanisms and Structures, John Wiley & Sons, (19920000), pages 69 - 74 | - VELY F. et al., "BIAcore® analysis to test phosphopeptide-SH2 domain interactions", Methods in Molecular Biology, (20000000), vol. 121, pages 313 - 21 | - LIPAROTO et al., "Biosensor analysis of the interleukin-2 receptor complex", Journal of Molecular Recognition, (19990000), vol. 12, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1099-1352(199909/10)12:5<316::AID-JMR468>3.3.CO;2-T, pages 316 - 21, XP001070799 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-1352(199909/10)12:5<316::AID-JMR468>3.3.CO;2-T | - LIPSCHULTZ et al., "Experimental design for analysis of complex kinetics using surface plasmon resonance", Methods, (20000000), vol. 20, no. 3, doi:10.1006/meth.1999.0924, pages 310 - 8, XP004466887 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/meth.1999.0924 | - MALMQVIST., "BIACORE: an affinity biosensor system for characterization of biomolecular interactions", Biochemical Society Transactions, (19990000), vol. 27, pages 335 - 40, XP000956194 | - ALFTHAN, "Surface plasmon resonance biosensors as a tool in antibody engineering", Biosensors & Bioelectronics, (19980000), vol. 13, doi:10.1016/S0956-5663(98)00020-7, pages 653 - 63, XP026050117 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(98)00020-7 | - FIVASH et al., "BIAcore for macromolecular interaction", Current Opinion in Biotechnology, (19980000), vol. 9, pages 97 - 101 | - PRICE et al., "Summary report on the ISOBM TD-4 Workshop: analysis of 56 monoclonal antibodies against the MUC 1 mucin", Tumour Biology, (19980000), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 1 - 20 | - MALMQVIST et al., "Biomolecular interaction analysis: affinity biosensor technologies for functional analysis of proteins", Current Opinion in Chemical Biology, (19970000), vol. 1, doi:10.1016/S1367-5931(97)80077-4, pages 378 - 83, XP002978720 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1367-5931(97)80077-4 | - O'SHANNESSY et al., "Interpretation of deviations from pseudo-first-order kinetic behavior in the characterization of ligand binding by biosensor technology", Analytical Biochemistry, (19960000), vol. 236, pages 275 - 83 | - MALMBORG et al., "BIAcore as a tool in antibody engineering", Journal of Immunological Methods, (19950000), vol. 183, doi:10.1016/0022-1759(95)00018-6, pages 7 - 13, XP004021020 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(95)00018-6 | - VAN REGENMORTEL, "Use of biosensors to characterize recombinant proteins", Developments in Biological Standardization, (19940000), vol. 83, pages 143 - 51 | - O'SHANNESSY, "Determination of kinetic rate and equilibrium binding constants for macromolecular interactions: a critique of the surface plasmon resonance literature", Current Opinions in Biotechnology, (19940000), vol. 5, doi:10.1016/S0958-1669(05)80072-2, pages 65 - 71, XP022839327 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(05)80072-2 | - GORDON, A. J.FORD, R. A., The Chemist's Companion: A Handbook Of Practical Data, Techniques, And References, John Wiley and Sons, (19720000), page 437 | - DANDLIKER, W. B. et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19810000), vol. 74, pages 155 - 194 | - OWICKI et al., "Application of Fluorescence Polarization Assays in High-Throughput Screening", Genetic Engineering News, (19970000), vol. 17, page 27 | - CHECOVICH, W. J. et al., Nature, (19950000), vol. 375, pages 254 - 256 | - PARKER et al., "Development of high throughput screening assays using fluorescence polarization: nuclear receptor-ligand-binding and kinase/phosphatase assays", J Biomol Screen, (20000000), vol. 5, doi:10.1177/108705710000500204, pages 77 - 88, XP001039835 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/108705710000500204 | - HEIM et al., Curr. Biol., (19960000), vol. 6, pages 178 - 182 | - MITRA et al., Gene, (19960000), vol. 173, pages 13 - 17 | - SELVIN et al., Meth. Enzymol., (19950000), vol. 246, pages 300 - 345 | - HANSELMAN et al., J. Lipid Res., (19970000), vol. 38, pages 2365 - 2373 | - KAHL et al., Anal. Biochem., (19960000), vol. 243, pages 282 - 283 | - NICHOLS et al., Anal. Biochem., (19980000), vol. 257, pages 112 - 119 | - FIESERFIESER, Reagents for Organic Synthesis, John Wiley, and Sons, (19910000), vol. 1-40 | - Larock's Comprehensive Organic Transformations, Elsevier Science Publishers, (19890000), vol. 1-5 |