EP3956632 - ADDRESSABLE VERTICAL CAVITY SURFACE EMITTING LASER ARRAY FOR GENERATING STRUCTURED LIGHT PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2023/47] |
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states Facebook Technologies, LLC. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GINZBURG, Jonatan 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20722940.2 | 10.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020US27753 | Priority number, date | US201962835965P | 18.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962835965 P | US201916521480 | 24.07.2019 Original published format: US201916521480 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020214503 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3956632 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/25, H01S5/42 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
G01B11/2513 (EP,US);
H01S5/423 (EP,CN,US);
H01S5/4087 (US);
G03B21/2013 (CN);
G03B21/2033 (CN);
H01S5/02345 (EP,CN);
H01S5/042 (CN);
H01S5/04256 (EP);
H01S5/06233 (US);
H01S5/06236 (US);
H01S5/0624 (US);
H01S5/06243 (US);
H01S5/4025 (US);
H01S5/4081 (US);
G02B27/0172 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | ADRESSIERBARE OBERFLÄCHENEMITTIERENDE LASERANORDNUNG MIT VERTIKALEN HOHLRÄUMEN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON STRUKTURIERTEN LICHTMUSTERN | [2022/08] | English: | ADDRESSABLE VERTICAL CAVITY SURFACE EMITTING LASER ARRAY FOR GENERATING STRUCTURED LIGHT PATTERNS | [2022/08] | French: | RÉSEAU LASER À ÉMISSION PAR LA SURFACE À CAVITÉ VERTICALE ADRESSABLE POUR LA GÉNÉRATION DE MOTIFS LUMINEUX STRUCTURÉS | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 21.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2014376092 (MOR ZAFRIR [IL]) [X] 1,4,8,10-12,16,17,19,20 * paragraphs [0046] - [0056]; figures 5A, 5B; claims 1-3 * [Y] 5,6,14,15 [I] 2,5,13,14,18; | [XYI]EP2827175 (PRINCETON OPTRONICS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7,9-12,16,17,19,20 * paragraphs [0061] - [0063] - [0 73] - [0094]; figures 4, 7-9 * [Y] 5,6,14,15 [I] 2,5,13,14,18; | [A]US2017195653 (TRAIL NICHOLAS DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]EP3282285 (OCULUS VR LLC [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2019040506 (PRINCETON OPTRONICS INC [US]) [Y] 5,6,14,15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0033]; figures 3, 4(a) *; | [XP]WO2020050777 (AMS SENSORS ASIA PTE LTD [SG]) [XP] 1,3,4,8-13,16-20 * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] - [0037] , [0040] - [0044]; figures 1,2,5,7,10-12 * |