Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210146953 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1903123 | 26.03.2019 | WO2020FR00059 | 16.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7541996B | Global Dossier | 29.08.2024 | B2 | JP2022528619 | 15.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1903123 | 26.03.2019 | WO2020FR00059 | 16.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113631611B | Global Dossier | 23.02.2024 | B | CN113631611 | 09.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1903123 | 26.03.2019 | WO2020FR00059 | 16.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3947504 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1903123 | 26.03.2019 | WO2020FR00059 | 16.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11202110316V | 28.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1903123 | 26.03.2019 | WO2020FR00059 | 16.03.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020193874 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1903123 | 26.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3094451 | 23.12.2022 | B1 | FR3094451 | 02.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1903123 | 26.03.2019 |