EP3972616 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR INHIBITING AMYLOID BETA ACCUMULATION AND/OR AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innopeutics Corporation 510 ho, (Seongsu-dong 2-ga, HausD Sejong Tower) 26, Seongsuil-ro 10-gil Seongdong-gu Seoul 04793 / KR | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sang Hun 121-1502, 82, Haengdang-ro, Seongdong-gu Seoul 04717 / KR | 02 /
SONG, Jae Jin 18, Bangullae-ro 7-gil, Mapo-gu Seoul 03961 / KR | 03 /
YANG, Yun Seon Rm 1119, 1022, Tongil-ro, Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 03311 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Tae Gyun 103-1302, 16, Teheran-ro 52-gil, Gangnam-gu Seoul 06213 / KR | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20730538.4 | 12.03.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020KR03439 | Priority number, date | KR20190060883 | 23.05.2019 Original published format: KR 20190060883 | KR20200006861 | 17.01.2020 Original published format: KR 20200006861 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020117031 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3972616 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61K35/30, A61K31/7088, A61P25/28, A61K31/7105, A61K48/00, C07K14/47, C12N15/86 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/7105 (EP);
A61K48/00 (KR);
C07K14/70567 (US);
A61K35/30 (EP,KR);
A61K38/177 (EP);
A61K48/005 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/47 (US);
C07K14/4702 (EP);
C07K14/4711 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/0085 (US);
C12N2740/16044 (EP);
C12N2750/14143 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | A61K35/30, A61K31/7088, A61P25/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HEMMUNG DER AMYLOID-BETA-SAMMLUNG UND/ODER -AGGREGATION | [2022/13] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR INHIBITING AMYLOID BETA ACCUMULATION AND/OR AGGREGATION | [2022/13] | French: | COMPOSITION ET MÉTHODE D'INHIBITION DE L'ACCUMULATION ET/OU DE L'AGRÉGATION DE BÊTA-AMYLOÏDES | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 11.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - "Combined Nurr1 and Foxa2 roles in the therapy of Parkinson's disease", EMBO MOLECULAR MEDICINE, US, vol. 7, no. 5, doi:10.15252/emmm.201404610, ISSN 1757-4676, (20150501), pages 510 - 525, URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/full-xml/10.15252/emmm.201404610, XP055786266 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 510, column l, paragraph 1 - page 523, column l, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.15252/emmm.201404610 | [Y] - SONG JAE-JIN ET AL, "Cografting astrocytes improves cell therapeutic outcomes in a Parkinson's disease model", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, GB, vol. 128, no. 1, doi:10.1172/JCI93924, ISSN 0021-9738, (20171211), pages 463 - 482, URL: https://www.jci.org/articles/view/93924/version/4/pdf/render.pdf, XP055923558 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 463, column l, paragraph 1 - page 480, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI93924 | [Y] - BRONZUOLI MARIA ROSANNA ET AL, "Targeting neuroinflammation in Alzheimer's disease", JOURNAL OF INFLAMMATION RESEARCH, Volume 9, doi:10.2147/JIR.S86958, (20161103), pages 199 - 208, URL: https://www.dovepress.com/getfile.php?fileID=33385, XP055923560 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 199, paragraph 1 - page 205, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/JIR.S86958 | [Y] - MOON MINHO ET AL, "Nurr1 (NR4A2) regulates Alzheimer?s disease-related pathogenesis and cognitive function in the 5XFAD mouse model", AGING CELL, GB, vol. 18, no. 1, doi:10.1111/acel.12866, ISSN 1474-9718, (20181204), pages 1 - 11, URL: https://api.wiley.com/onlinelibrary/tdm/v1/articles/10.1111%2Facel.12866, XP055786262 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 2, column l, paragraph 1 - page 9, column r, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/acel.12866 | International search | [A]KR20120003098 (IUCF HYU [KR]) [A] 1-21; | [X]US2017354688 (LEE SANG-HUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-21; | [A]WO2018185260 (HELMHOLTZ ZENTRUM MUENCHEN DEUTSCHES FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM GESUNDHEIT & UMWELT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-21; | [A]US2018339000 (KERN RUSSELL A [US], et al) [A] 1-21; | [A]KR20190051837 (IUCF HYU [KR])[A] 1-21 | by applicant | - SAURA J, "Microglia in astroglial cultures: a cautionary note", J Neuroinflammation, (20070000), vol. 4, page 26, XP021037913 | - HEINRICH CGASCON SMASSERDOTTI GLEPIER ASANCHEZ RSIMON-EBERT TSCHROEDER TGOTZ MBERNINGER B, "Generation of subtype-specific neurons from postnatal astroglia of the mouse cerebral cortex", Nat Protoc, (20110000), vol. 6, pages 214 - 228 | - BLASI EBARLUZZI RBOCCHINI VMAZZOLLA RBISTONI F, "Immortalization of murine microglia by a v-raf/v-myc carrying retrovirus", J Neuroimmunol, (19900000), vol. 27, pages 229 - 237 | - YANG, C. N.WU, M. F.LIU, C. C.JUNG, W. H.CHANG, Y. C.LEE, W. P.CHAN, C. C., "Differential protective effects of connective tissue growth factor against Abeta neurotoxicity on neurons and glia", Hum Mol Genet, (20170000), vol. 26, no. 20, pages 3909 - 3921 | - RIES, M.SASTRE, M, "Mechanisms of Abeta Clearance and Degradation by Glia", Front Aging Neurosci, (20160000), vol. 8, page 160 | - CZIRR, E. et al., "Microglial complement receptor 3 regulates brain Abeta levels through secreted proteolytic activity", J Exp Med, (20170000), vol. 214, no. 4, pages 1081 - 1092 | - HONG, S.BEJA-GLASSER, V. F.NFONOYIM, B. M.FROUIN, A.LI, S.RAMAKRISHNAN, S.MERRY K.M.SHI Q.ROSENTHAL A.BARRES B.A., "Complement and microglia mediate early synapse loss in Alzheimer mouse models", Science, (20160000), vol. 352, no. 6286, pages 712 - 716 | - SHI, Q. et al., "Complement C3 deficiency protects against neurodegeneration in aged plaque-rich APP/PS1 mice", Sci Transl Med, (20170000), vol. 9, no. 392 | - KANG, S. S. et al., "Microglial translational profiling reveals a convergent APOE pathway from aging, amyloid, and tau", J Exp Med, (20180000), vol. 215, no. 9, pages 2235 - 2245 | - VENEGAS, C. et al., "Microglia-derived ASC specks cross-seed amyloid-beta in Alzheimer's disease", Nature, (20170000), vol. 552, no. 7685, doi:10.1038/nature25158, pages 355 - 361, XP055473472 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature25158 | - HENEKA, M. T. et al., "NLRP3 is activated in Alzheimer's disease and contributes to pathology in APP/PS1 mice", Nature, (20130000), vol. 493, no. 7434, doi:10.1038/nature11729, pages 674 - 678, XP055125448 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature11729 | - BUSSIAN, T. J. et al., "Clearance of senescent glia prevents tau-dependent pathology and cognitive decline", Nature, (20180000), vol. 562, no. 7728, pages 578 - 582 | - CHINTA, S. J. et al., "Cellular Senescence Is Induced by the Environmental Neurotoxin Paraquat and Contributes to Neuropathology Linked to Parkinson's Disease", Cell Rep, (20180000), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 930 - 940 | - BHAT, R. et al., "Astrocyte senescence as a component of Alzheimer's disease", PLoS One, (20120000), vol. 7, no. 9, page e45069 |