Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3913993
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.08.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.05.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.05.2024 |
First examination report |
|
15.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.03.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
25.03.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
25.02.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
25.02.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
24.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
22.10.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
28.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
10.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|