EP3896558 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISPLAYING CONTENT, AND TERMINAL AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xiao No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/42] | Ipside 7-9 Allées Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20741485.5 | 13.01.2020 | [2021/42] | WO2020CN71760 | Priority number, date | CN20191037059 | 15.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910037059 | [2021/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020147677 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3896558 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/04883, G06F3/04886, G06F1/16, G06F3/04817, G06F3/0482 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/04817 (EP,CN);
G06F1/1616 (EP,US);
G06F1/1641 (EP);
G06F1/1652 (EP);
G06F1/1677 (EP);
G06F3/0482 (EP);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/0485 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | G06F3/0488, G06F1/16, G06F3/0481 | ||
Former IPC [2021/42] | G06F3/0481 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE VON INHALTEN SOWIE ENDGERÄT UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/42] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISPLAYING CONTENT, AND TERMINAL AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR AFFICHER UN CONTENU, ET TERMINAL ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2021 | Translation filed | 12.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 21.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012097385 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0041]; figure 12 * * paragraph [0043]; figure 14 * * paragraph [0044]; figure 15 ** paragraph [0064] *; | [X]EP2720127 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0231]; figure 14 * * paragraph [0232]; figure 15 * * paragraph [0244]; figure 21 * | International search | [X]CN107704177 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [X] 1-20* description, paragraphs [0005]-[0018] and [0048]-[0056], and figure 1 * |