EP4004568 - TESTING DEVICE FOR ELECTRICAL CONDUCTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/22] | TEST DEVICE FOR ELECTRICAL LINES | ||
[2024/18] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adaptronic Prüftechnik GmbH Karl-Carstens-Straße 27 97877 Wertheim / DE | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIESER, Hans-Peter Mondfeld Nibelungenstrasse 69a 97877 Wertheim / DE | 02 /
HABERKORN, Michael Mondfeld Spieläcker 10 97877 Wertheim / DE | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | PPR AG BGZ Rotenbodenstrasse 12 9497 Triesenberg / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG BGZ Rotenbodenstrasse 12 9497 Triesenberg / LI | Application number, filing date | 20747143.4 | 24.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020IB57015 | Priority number, date | EP20190189488 | 31.07.2019 Original published format: EP 19189488 | [2022/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021019400 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004568 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/12, G01R31/16 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
G01R31/1272 (EP,CN,US);
G01N27/92 (CN);
G01R31/12 (EP);
G01R31/16 (EP,US);
G01R31/2863 (US);
G01R31/2868 (US);
G01R31/67 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | PRÜFVORRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTRISCHE LEITUNGEN | [2022/22] | English: | TESTING DEVICE FOR ELECTRICAL CONDUCTORS | [2024/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TEST POUR CONDUCTEURS ÉLECTRIQUES | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/22] | TEST DEVICE FOR ELECTRICAL LINES | ||
Former [2022/22] | DISPOSITIF DE TEST POUR LIGNES ÉLECTRIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 28.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4859953 (YOUNG DOUGLAS A [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 37; figures 2-4 * * column 5, line 13 - column 9, line 25 * [I] 6-24; | [I]FR2716721 (ELMETHERM [FR]) [I] 1,6-24* the whole document *; | [XDI]DE10024809 (WEE ELECTROTEST ENGINEERING GM [DE]) [XD] 1-5,23-25 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] , [0039] - [0044]; figure 5 * [I] 6-22 |