Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
27.02.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.11.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
28.10.2022 | Change - classification | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
28.10.2022 | Change - classification | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
29.04.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
29.04.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
20.02.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.11.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
26.11.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
02.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.09.2021 | Change - representative | |
07.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.08.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.08.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |