Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020271556 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016794849 | 19.02.2020 | US201962809062 | 22.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3130889 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962809062 | 22.02.2019 | WO2020US18789 | 19.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3928074 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2022 | A4 | EP3928074 | 29.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962809062 | 22.02.2019 | WO2020US18789 | 19.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020172247 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962809062 | 22.02.2019 |