Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12083298 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2024 | B2 | US2021393926 | 23.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019038774 | 04.03.2019 | WO2020JP05539 | 13.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2020179396 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019038774 | 04.03.2019 | WO2020JP05539 | 13.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024023487 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019038774 | 04.03.2019 | WO2020JP05539 | 13.02.2020 | JP2021503503 | 13.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113286626B | Global Dossier | 09.02.2024 | B | CN113286626 | 20.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019038774 | 04.03.2019 | WO2020JP05539 | 13.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3919111 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2024 | B1 | EP3919111 | 09.03.2022 | A4 | EP3919111 | 08.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019038774 | 04.03.2019 | WO2020JP05539 | 13.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020179396 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019038774 | 04.03.2019 |