EP3919111 - GUIDE WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TERUMO Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Shinji c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha, 1500, Inokuchi, Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | [2024/16] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
KONDO, Shinji Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20766463.2 | 13.02.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020JP05539 | Priority number, date | JP20190038774 | 04.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019038774 | [2021/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020179396 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919111 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3919111 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/09, A61B17/34, A61B17/22, // A61B17/00, A61B90/00 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
A61B17/3401 (EP);
A61M25/09 (US);
A61B17/3478 (EP,US);
A61M29/00 (US);
A61B17/3421 (EP);
A61B17/3494 (EP);
A61B17/3496 (EP);
A61B2017/00247 (EP);
A61B2017/22044 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | A61M25/09, A61B17/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSDRAHT | [2021/49] | English: | GUIDE WIRE | [2021/49] | French: | FIL DE GUIDAGE | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2021 | Translation filed | 31.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 25.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014182969 (CLPH LLC [US]); | [A]US2015289901 (KHAN AMAN SHABI [US], et al); | [XAI]WO2018181520 (TERUMO CORP [JP]); | [P]EP3603727 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]US2007219464 (DAVIS STEPHEN [US], et al); | [A]US2009198153 (SHRIVER EDGAR L [US]); | [A]WO2018181520 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) | by applicant | US8992556 | JP2019038774 |