EP3943488 - SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC AMIDE COMPOUND AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND PHARMACEUTICAL USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genfleet Therapeutics (Shanghai) Inc. Level 2/3/4/5, Suite 8 1206 Zhangjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | For all designated states Zhejiang Genfleet Therapeutics Co., Ltd. 4th Floor, No.3 South Building Medical Technology Industrial Park No.1 Yunhai Road Lihai Town Shaoxing Binhai New City, Zhejiang 312000 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | For all designated states Genfleet Therapeutics (Shanghai) Inc. Level 2/3/4/5, Suite 8 1206 Zhangjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | ||
For all designated states Zhejiang Genfleet Therapeutics Co., Ltd. 4th Floor No.3 South Building, Medical Technology Industrial Park, No.1 Yunhai Road, Lihai Town Shaoxing Binhai New City, Zhejiang 312000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Fusheng Level 2/3/4/5 Suite 8, 1206 Zhangjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
XU, Xiaoming Level 2/3/4/5 Suite 8, 1206 Zhangjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Leitao Level 2/3/4/5 Suite 8, 1206 Zhangjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Zhubo Level 2/3/4/5 Suite 8, 1206 Zhangjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 05 /
HU, Gang Level 2/3/4/5 Suite 8, 1206 Zhangjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 06 /
DING, Qian Level 2/3/4/5 Suite 8, 1206 Zhangjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 07 /
XIE, Fubo Level 2/3/4/5 Suite 8, 1206 Zhangjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 08 /
ZHENG, Biao Level 2/3/4/5 Suite 8, 1206 Zhangjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 09 /
LV, Qiang Level 2/3/4/5 Suite 8, 1206 Zhangjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 10 /
LAN, Jiong Level 2/3/4/5 Suite 8, 1206 Zhangjiang Road Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
ZHOU, Fusheng Shanghai 201203 / CN | ||
02 /
XU, Xiaoming Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Leitao Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
04 /
LIU, Zhubo Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
05 /
HU, Gang Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
06 /
DING, Qian Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
07 /
XIE, Fubo Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
08 /
ZHENG, Biao Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
09 /
LV, Qiang Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
10 /
LAN, Jiong Shanghai 201203 / CN | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20777468.8 | 20.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020CN80306 | Priority number, date | CN201910221799 | 22.03.2019 Original published format: CN201910221799 | [2022/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020192562 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943488 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/82, C07D471/04, A61K31/428, A61K31/437, A61P31/00 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,KR);
A61K31/4375 (EP);
A61K31/4439 (EP);
A61K31/444 (EP,KR);
A61K31/4545 (EP,KR);
A61K31/496 (EP);
A61P1/00 (KR);
A61P17/06 (KR);
A61P19/02 (KR);
A61P29/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE AMIDVERBINDUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/04] | English: | SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC AMIDE COMPOUND AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND PHARMACEUTICAL USE THEREOF | [2022/04] | French: | COMPOSÉ AMIDE HÉTÉROCYCLIQUE SUBSTITUÉ AINSI QUE SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION PHARMACEUTIQUE | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2021 | Translation filed | 13.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 27.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO2006038116 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [A] 2, 3, 6, 8-16, 18-21* entire document *; | [A]WO2009017822 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1, 3-7, 11-17, 19-21 * entire document *; | [X]WO2018148626 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [X] 2, 3, 6, 8-16, 18-21 * claim 1, description, page 24, line 20 to page 26, line 17, and page 27, lines 26 and 27, and page 67, lines 1-4 *; | [A]CN109053630 (UNIV PLA 2ND MILITARY MEDICAL) [A] 1, 3-7, 11-17, 19-21 * claims 1 and 5-10, and description, paragraphs [0094]-[0097] * | by applicant | - Cell, (19950000), vol. 81, pages 513 - 523 | - Immunity, (19970000), vol. 7, pages 821 - 830 | - Immunity, (19960000), vol. 4, pages 387 - 396 | - Nat Immunol, (20040000), vol. 5, pages 503 - 507 | - EMBO Rep, (20090000), vol. 10, pages 916 - 922 | - J.Biol.Chem., (19990000), vol. 274, pages 16871 - 16875 | - Curr.Biol., (19990000), vol. 9, pages 539 - 542 | - J.Biol.Chem., (20050000), vol. 280, pages 36560 - 36566 | - Cell Signal, (20150200), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 306 - 14 | - J.Biol.Chem., (20040000), vol. 279, pages 7925 - 7933 | - Cell, (20030000), vol. 114, pages 181 - 190 | - Mol.Cell, (20060000), vol. 22, pages 245 - 257 | - J.Mol.Biol., (20100000), vol. 396, pages 528 - 539 | - Nat.Immunol, (20080000), vol. 9, pages 1037 - 1046 | - Proc.Natl.Acad.Sci.USA., (20080000), vol. 105, pages 11778 - 11783 | - Sci.Signal, (20100000), vol. 115, page re4 | - Cell Death Dis, (20110000), vol. 2, page 2e115 | - FEBS J, (20120000), vol. 278, pages 877 - 887 | - Cell, (20120000), vol. 148, pages 228 - 243 | - Proc.Natl.Acad.Sci.USA., (20120000), vol. 109, pages 5322 - 5327 | - Nat.Rev.Immunol, (20080000), vol. 8, pages 279 - 289 | - Nature, (20110000), vol. 477, pages 330 - 334 | - Immunity, (20110000), vol. 35, pages 908 - 918 | - PNAS, (20100000), vol. 107, pages 21695 - 21700 | - Proc.Natl.Acad.Sci., (20120000), vol. 109, no. 36, pages 14598 - 14603 | - Cell, (20090000), vol. 137, pages 1100 - 1111 | - Nat.Chem.Biol., (20050000), vol. 1, pages 112 - 119 | - J.Neurosci.Res., (20100000), vol. 88, pages 1569 - 1576 | - Kidney Int, (20120000), vol. 81, pages 751 - 761 | - Ren.Fail., (20120000), vol. 34, pages 373 - 377 | - Neurochem.Res., (20120000), vol. 37, pages 1849 - 1858 | - Genes Dev, (20130000), vol. 27, pages 1640 - 1649 | - Cell Host&Microbe, (20140000), vol. 15, pages 23 - 35 | - Cell, (20130000), vol. 153, pages 1 - 14 |