Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11426235 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2022 | B2 | US2021085385 | 25.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962902699 | 19.09.2019 | US202016948362 | 15.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3972511 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2023 | B1 | EP3972511 | 30.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962902699 | 19.09.2019 | WO2020US50817 | 15.09.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021055320 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962902699 | 19.09.2019 |