EP4034203 - INTERCONNECTION OF DRUG ADMINISTRATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1125 Trenton-Harbourton Road Titusville, NJ 08560 / US | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAKOS, Gregory J. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 02 /
BARATTA, Michael A. 200 Tournament Drive HTD-61 Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US | 03 /
DOU, Yueheng 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, Massachusetts 02767 / US | 04 /
HARRIS, Jason L. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 05 /
HUBERT, Emma Louise 510 Cottonwood Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | 06 /
KAPIL, Monica A. 510 Cottonwood Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | 07 /
KRULEVITCH, Peter 510 Cottonwood Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | 08 /
LEQUIEU, Wouter Jacques Noel Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | 09 /
PEREZ, Dolores 200 Tournament Drive HTD-61 Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US | 10 /
PHILLIPS, Whitney 3214 NE Tiillicum Circle Camas, Washington 98607 / US | 11 /
SHELTON, IV, Frederick E. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 12 /
YAN, Hong 510 Cottonwood Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20786337.4 | 24.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020IB58966 | Priority number, date | US201962905441P | 25.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962905441 P | US201962905442P | 25.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962905442 P | US201962905443P | 25.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962905443 P | US201962905445P | 25.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962905445 P | US202063020928P | 06.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063020928 P | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021059210 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034203 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/50, G16H40/40 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
G16H40/63 (EP,IL,KR);
G16H20/17 (KR,US);
G16H20/13 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M11/005 (KR);
A61M11/041 (KR);
A61M15/0066 (KR);
A61M15/0085 (KR);
A61M15/009 (KR);
A61M15/08 (KR);
A61M5/14244 (KR);
A61M5/1723 (EP,IL,KR);
A61M5/20 (KR);
G16H20/10 (EP,IL);
G16H40/40 (EP,IL);
H04L63/0421 (US);
H04W12/037 (US);
A61M2005/208 (EP,IL,KR);
A61M2205/3553 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG VON MEDIKAMENTENVERABREICHUNGSSYSTEMEN | [2022/31] | English: | INTERCONNECTION OF DRUG ADMINISTRATION SYSTEMS | [2022/31] | French: | INTERCONNEXION DE SYSTÈMES D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 25.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006047538 (CONDURSO JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 1-90 * the whole document *; | [YD]US2007251835 (MEHTA KAEZAD J [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0165] , [ 173] , [ 178] , [ 191] *; | [Y]WO2011150032 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US8332240 (GARVER MICHAEL K [US], et al) [Y] 1-90 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 2 *; | [Y]US2014275748 (DUNKI-JACOBS ADAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-90 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2014152704 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [Y] 1-90 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0009] - [0031] - [0 40] , [0 43] - [0060] - [0064] - [0078] - [0 81] - [0089]; figures 1-11; claims 1-19 *; | [Y]WO2015187793 (AMGEN INC [US]) [Y] 1-90 * paragraphs [0017] , [0122] , [0159] , [0215] , [0217] - [0218] - [0222] , [0229] , [0311] *; | [Y]WO2016040512 (MYLAN INC [US]) [Y] 1-90 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1-2 *; | [Y]US2016166768 (EDWARDS ERIC S [US], et al) [Y] 1-90 * paragraphs [0318] - [0321] - [0334]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO2017051271 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-90* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2017089317 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-90 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5363842 | US2002014951 | US2002042596 | US2002077852 | US2002091454 | US2005027791 | US2007251835 | US2008139907 | US2009069787 | US2009202387 | US2011295337 | US2012330684 | US2014081659 | US8696616 | US2014243635 | US9168000 | US2016045674 | US9427580 | US2017286610 |