Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022195249 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019077578 | 16.04.2019 | WO2020JP16089 | 10.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7374183B | Global Dossier | 06.11.2023 | B2 | JPWO2020213521 | 22.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019077578 | 16.04.2019 | WO2020JP16089 | 10.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113748019 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019077578 | 16.04.2019 | WO2020JP16089 | 10.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3957478 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2023 | B1 | EP3957478 | 15.06.2022 | A4 | EP3957478 | 23.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019077578 | 16.04.2019 | WO2020JP16089 | 10.04.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020213521 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019077578 | 16.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI840548B | 01.05.2024 | B | TW202103945 | 01.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019077578 | 16.04.2019 |