EP3957478 - BINDING TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Denka Company Limited 1-1 Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TATE, Yousuke c/o Denka Company Limited, 1-1, Nihonbashi- Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA, Akiyoshi c/o Denka Company Limited, 1-1, Nihonbashi- Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMURA, Daisuke c/o Denka Company Limited, 1-1, Nihonbashi- Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | Gerauer, Marc Philippé Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20792176.8 | 10.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020JP16089 | Priority number, date | JP20190077578 | 16.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019077578 | [2022/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020213521 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957478 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3957478 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, B65D63/10, D04H3/011, D04H3/16, C09J7/21, C09J7/38, D04H3/14 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
B65D63/1009 (EP);
C09J7/21 (EP,US);
D04H3/011 (EP,US);
D04H3/14 (EP,US);
C09J2203/302 (EP,US);
C09J2400/263 (EP,US);
C09J2467/006 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/08] | B32B27/00, B65D63/10, D04H3/011, D04H3/16, C09J7/21, C09J7/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BINDEBAND | [2022/08] | English: | BINDING TAPE | [2022/08] | French: | BANDE DE LIAISON | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2021 | Translation filed | 05.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 14.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | CZ | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | IT | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
CZ | 18.10.2023 | ||
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2006210228 ; | [X]EP1194495 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [Y]US2004082243 (KUELPER KLAUS [US]); | [D]JP2006210228 (NITTO SHINKO KK, et al); | International search | [A]JP2003503538 ; | [A]JP2004524376 ; | [A]JP2006210228 (NITTO SHINKO KK, et al); | [A]JP2006520863 ; | [A]WO2011081132 (SEKISUI POLYMATECH CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2004524376 | JP2006210228 |