EP4049471 - CHIP, DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MAINTAINING A CONNECTION TO AT LEAST ONE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES DIS FRANCE SAS 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2023/32] |
Former [2022/35] | For all designated states Thales Dis France SAS 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | ||
For all designated states THALES DIS AIS Deutschland GmbH Werinherstraße 81 81541 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINE, Jean-Yves THALES DIS FRANCE SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS CEDEX / FR | 02 /
CHENE, Gilles THALES DIS FRANCE SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | 03 /
BOTUHA, Stéphane THALES DIS FRANCE SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | 04 /
DELAGE, Frederic THALES DIS FRANCE SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | 05 /
BREUER, Volker Schwalbenring 20 16727 BOETZOW / DE | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Christine Marie Catherine Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department Avenue du Jujubier ZI Athélia IV 13705 La Ciotat / FR | [2023/40] |
Former [2022/35] | Thomas, Christine Marie Catherine THALES DIS FRANCE SA Intellectual Property Department Avenue du Jujubier ZI Athélia IV 13705 La Ciotat / FR | Application number, filing date | 20793398.7 | 26.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020EP80068 | Priority number, date | EP20190290110 | 25.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19290110 | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021079001 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049471 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4049471 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/60, H04W48/18, H04W88/06, H04W8/18 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H04W4/60 (EP);
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W8/183 (EP);
H04W88/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | H04W4/60, H04W48/18, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIP, GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFRECHTERHALTUNG EINER VERBINDUNG ZU MINDESTENS EINEM NETZWERK | [2023/22] | English: | CHIP, DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MAINTAINING A CONNECTION TO AT LEAST ONE NETWORK | [2022/35] | French: | PUCE, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE MAINTENIR UNE CONNEXION À AU MOINS UN RÉSEAU | [2023/22] |
Former [2022/35] | CHIP, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFRECHTERHALTUNG EINER VERBINDUNG ZU MINDESTENS EINEM NETZWERK | ||
Former [2022/35] | PUCE, DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MAINTENIR UNE CONNEXION À AU MOINS UN RÉSEAU | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 25.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | MC | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | LU | 26.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
IT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SK | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
LU | 26.10.2023 | ||
BE | 31.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
LU | 26.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
LU | 26.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
LU | 26.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
LU | 26.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2012027059 (ZHAO SULI [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 52] - [0060] * * paragraphs [0083] - [0090]; figure 10 * * paragraphs [0091] - [0096]; figure 11 * * figures 14, 18 * [I] 4; | [Y]US2013100887 (KIM HYE-JEONG [KR]) [Y] 1,2,5-8,10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 42] , [0 55] * * paragraphs [0066] - [0074]; figure 3 *; | [Y]US2013329639 (WIETFELDT RICHARD DOMINIC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-8,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraphs [0075] - [0079] - [0 81]; figure 8 ** paragraphs [0056] - [0065]; figures 7A-D * | by applicant | US9674880 |