EP4070562 - MULTIMEDIA CONTENT STEERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Netflix, Inc. 100 Winchester Circle Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEEK, Lara 100 Winchester Circle Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | 02 /
SHASTRI, Ishaan 100 Winchester Circle Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | 03 /
VORA, Mohit 100 Winchester Circle Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20796675.5 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020US53524 | Priority number, date | US201916705035 | 05.12.2019 Original published format: US201916705035 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021112945 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070562 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/472, H04N21/2343, H04L12/701, H04L12/751, H04W40/02, H04L29/06, H04N21/258, H04N21/647, H04L12/707 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
H04N21/47202 (EP);
H04L47/726 (US);
H04L45/08 (EP);
H04L45/24 (EP);
H04L45/306 (EP);
H04L45/70 (EP);
H04L47/125 (EP,US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L65/75 (US);
H04L65/756 (EP);
H04L65/762 (EP);
H04L65/80 (EP);
H04L67/02 (US);
H04N21/238 (US);
H04N21/2665 (US);
H04N21/47217 (US);
H04N21/647 (EP);
H04N21/64723 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | MULTIMEDIA-INHALTSLENKUNG | [2022/41] | English: | MULTIMEDIA CONTENT STEERING | [2022/41] | French: | DIRECTION DE CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 26.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005032057 (DIDEONET CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2006088063 (HARTUNG JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0006] , [00 7] , [0 50] - [0052] *; | [A]US2012106446 (YOUSEFI NARIMAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 21 *; | [XYI]US2014280906 (JOHNS KEVIN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-14,20 * figures 1, 2, 7 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0 24] , [0 37] , [0 40] , [0 51] , [0 75] , [0 77] , [0 79] , [0 82] * [Y] 15-19 [I] 8,9; | [A]CN102594679B (SHANGHAI SYNACAST MEDIA TECH) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0043] *; | [A]US2017013040 (PONEKKER ZOLTÁN [HU], et al) [A] 1-20* figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US2017302575 (WARD DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 17 * paragraphs [0078] - [0080] *; | [A]US2018270284 (LEE SEAN S [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0034] - [0035] - [0 70] *; | [A]CN104735550B (BEIJING STARTIMES SOFTWARE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0077] *; | [A]US2019281133 (TOMKINS ROBERT KEVIN [CA]) [A] 1-20 * figures 1-11 *; | [Y]US2019312810 (STROM JOSE DANIEL PEREA [ES], et al) [Y] 15,16,18,19 * paragraph [0348] * |