EP3946302 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apkarian Technologies LLC 150 W Eugene Street Nr.29 Chicago, IL 60614 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
APKARIAN, A., Vania 150 W. Eugenie Street, 29 Chicago, IL 60614 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
APKARIAN, A., Vania Chicago, IL 60614 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20802537.9 | 08.05.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US32142 | Priority number, date | US201962845782P | 09.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962845782 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020227646 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946302 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/167, A61K31/192, A61K31/198, A61K31/428 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K31/167 (US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/425 (US);
A61K31/428 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/192, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/428, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR SCHMERZBEHANDLUNG | [2022/06] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING PAIN | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 30.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005107467 (DESCARTES THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010010136 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2014025638 (MYLAN INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0007] , [0015]; claims 1,9,11 *; | [X]US2017143681 (APKARIAN A VANIA [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0095] - [0097] * * paragraphs [0111] - [0112] * * examples 5-14 * * claims 1-66 *; | [A] - HOLMAN A J ET AL, "A Randomized Double Blind Placebo Controlled Trial of Pramipexole, a Dopamine Agonist, in Patinets with Fibromyalgia Receiving Concimitant Medication", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, US, (20050101), vol. 52, no. 8, doi:10.1002/ART.21191, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 2495 - 2506, XP002454911 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.21191 | International search | [A]US2010029723 (QUIK MARYKA [US], et al) [A] 1-7, 225-395, 424* entire document *; | [A]US2011230513 (LAMENSDORF ITSCHAK [IL], et al) [A] 1-7, 225-395, 424 * entire document *; | [Y]US8946152 (GILL STEVEN S [GB], et al) [Y] 388, 390-395 * entire document *; | [A]US2015301030 (EGGAN KEVIN C [US], et al) [A] 1-7, 225-395, 424 * entire document *; | [XY]US2017143681 (APKARIAN A VANIA [US]) [X] 1-7, 225-387, 424 * entire document * [Y] 388, 390-395 |