EP3969458 - CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS AS JAK INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/12] | CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS | ||
[2024/23] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reactive Biosciences, Inc. 8 Davis Drive, Suite 320 Durham, NC 27709 / US | [2024/04] |
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states Borah, Inc. 3835 Cleghorn Ave., Suite 300 Nashville, TN 37215 / US | ||
Former [2022/12] | For all designated states Boragen, Inc. P.O. Box 110066 65 T.W. Alexander Dr. Durham, NC 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Yasheen 62 Sanders Ranch Road Moraga, CA 94556 / US | 02 /
LIU, Chunliang 253 Northlands Drive Cary, NC 27519 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Yong-Kang 5151 Westmont Ave. San Jose, CA 95130 / US | 04 /
AUBREY, Marissa 11 Lansgate Ct. Durham, NC 27713 / US | 05 /
LIU, Chun, Yu 1004 Redfern Way Durham, NC 27707 / US | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/12] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 20806064.0 | 12.05.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020US70042 | Priority number, date | US201962846785P | 13.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962846785 P | US201962911012P | 04.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962911012 P | US201962949353P | 17.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962949353 P | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020232470 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3969458 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02, A61K31/69, A61P17/00, A61P17/06, A61P19/02, A61P29/00, A61K45/06 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
C07F5/02 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07F5/025 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/12] | C07F5/02, A61K31/69, A61P17/00, A61P17/06, A61P19/02, A61P29/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | CHEMISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ALS JAK-INHIBITOREN | [2024/23] | English: | CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS AS JAK INHIBITORS | [2024/23] | French: | COMPOSÉS CHIMIQUES COMME INHIBITEURS DE JAK | [2024/23] |
Former [2022/12] | CHEMISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | ||
Former [2022/12] | CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS | ||
Former [2022/12] | COMPOSÉS CHIMIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 10.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2955181 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-22 * example 1 page 387; paragraph [0004] *; | [A]WO2018055316 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [A] 1-22* page 185; example 71.5 * | International search | [A]WO2012085176 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-7, 9, 10, 29-32 , 37-40, 42-50 * claims 1-21 *; | [A]US2014023614 (BARAWKAR DINESH [IN], et al) [A] 1-7, 9, 10, 29-32 , 37-40, 42-50 * claims 1, 2, 10 *; | [A]US2014200344 (HAYASHI KEISHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7, 9, 10, 29-32 , 37-40, 42-50 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015368245 (TAKAHASHI KEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7, 9, 10, 29-32 , 37-40, 42-50* the whole document *; | [A]CN108341835 (CHIA TAI TIANQING PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-7, 9, 10, 29-32 , 37-40, 42-50 * claims 1-10 * |