EP3972551 - SUBSTANCE DELIVERY PLANNING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syqe Medical Ltd. 14 HaTchiya Street 6816914 Tel-Aviv / IL | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIDSON, Perry 2 Shimon Ben Shatakh Street 6802002 Tel-Aviv / IL | 02 /
EISENSCHER, Ianiv Yosef 23 Motzkin Street, Apt 8 6228828 Tel Aviv-Yafo / IL | 03 /
HOFFMANN, Yotam 28 Lamed Street 1321500 Safed / IL | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Bettinastraße 53-55 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 20810569.2 | 21.05.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020IL50559 | Priority number, date | US201962850580P | 21.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962850580 P | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020234883 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3972551 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/30, A61J7/04, G16H20/10, A61B5/00, A61M15/00 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
A61J7/0076 (EP,IL);
G16H20/13 (US);
A24F40/10 (EP,IL);
A24F40/50 (EP,IL);
A24F40/60 (EP,IL);
A24F40/65 (EP,IL);
A61B5/0022 (EP,IL);
A61B5/01 (EP,IL);
A61B5/1112 (EP,IL);
A61B5/1124 (EP,IL);
A61B5/1128 (EP,IL);
A61B5/14546 (EP,IL);
A61B5/163 (EP,IL);
A61B5/165 (EP,IL);
A61B5/4839 (EP,IL);
A61B5/4845 (EP,IL);
A61B5/7246 (EP,IL);
A61B5/7275 (EP,IL);
A61B5/7435 (EP,IL);
A61J7/0418 (EP,IL);
A61J7/0445 (EP,IL);
A61J7/0481 (EP,IL);
A61K36/185 (US);
A61M11/042 (EP,IL);
A61M15/0065 (EP,IL);
G16H20/10 (EP,IL);
G16H50/20 (EP,IL);
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | A61J7/04, G16H20/10, A61B5/00, A61M15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | SUBSTANZABGABEPLANUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/13] | English: | SUBSTANCE DELIVERY PLANNING SYSTEM | [2022/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PLANIFICATION D'ADMINISTRATION DE SUBSTANCE | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 28.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017157343 (DAVIDSON PERRY [IL], et al); | [I]US2019015382 (DAVIDSON PERRY [IL], et al); | [I]US2019027240 (DAVIDSON PERRY [IL], et al) | International search | [A]US2014156064 (CRAWFORD PATRICIA [US], et al) [A] 1* in particularly paragraphs 4,18,51 *; | [A]US2016103977 (MANDEL JEFFREY E [US]) [A] 1 * in particularly paragraphs 6,43 *; | [A]US2017147779 (GLAUSER TRACY A [US], et al) [A] 1 * in particularly paragraph 10,1 2 *; | [XY]US2018089393 (ZDEBLICK MARK J [US], et al) [X] 1-10, 16-18, 21-23, 27, 30-32, 36, 37, 39-50 * The whole document The whole document * [Y] 11-14, 19, 20, 24-26, 28, 29, 33-35, 38; | [XY]US2019027240 (DAVIDSON PERRY [IL], et al) [X] 3, 7, 8, 10, 15, 17, 18, 23, 30, 32, 36, 37, 39-42 * The whole document The whole document * [Y] 11-14, 19, 20, 24-26, 28, 29, 33-35, 38 |