Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.01.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
13.01.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
16.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.11.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.08.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
19.08.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
19.08.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
25.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.05.2022 | Change - representative | |
27.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.05.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
30.11.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication |