Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023002777 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202001998 | 13.02.2020 | WO2020GB52873 | 11.11.2020 | GB201916452 | 12.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220097492 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | GB202001998 | 13.02.2020 | WO2020GB52873 | 11.11.2020 | GB201916452 | 12.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023504593 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | GB202001998 | 13.02.2020 | WO2020GB52873 | 11.11.2020 | GB201916452 | 12.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114667161 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | GB202001998 | 13.02.2020 | WO2020GB52873 | 11.11.2020 | GB201916452 | 12.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4058067 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202001998 | 13.02.2020 | WO2020GB52873 | 11.11.2020 | GB201916452 | 12.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201916452D0 | 25.12.2019 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201916452 | 12.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB202001998D0 | 01.04.2020 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB202001998 | 13.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021094752 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202001998 | 13.02.2020 | GB201916452 | 12.11.2019 |