EP4058067 - PRODUCTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford BioMedica (UK) Limited Windrush Court Transport Way Oxford, OX4 6LT / GB | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARLEY, Daniel OXFORD BIOMEDICA (UK) LIMITED Windrush Court Transport Way Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/38] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20811049.4 | 11.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020GB52873 | Priority number, date | GB20190016452 | 12.11.2019 Original published format: GB 201916452 | GB20200001998 | 13.02.2020 Original published format: GB 202001998 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021094752 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4058067 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C12N7/00, C12N15/69, C12N15/86 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
C12N15/67 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,KR,US);
A61K48/00 (KR,US);
C12N2740/16043 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2740/16051 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2750/14151 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2840/102 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2840/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | PRODUKTIONSSYSTEM | [2022/38] | English: | PRODUCTION SYSTEM | [2022/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 27.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2015092440 (OXFORD BIOMEDICA LTD [GB]) [X] 63,64,67-92 * abstract * * page 4, line 19 - page 9, line 31 * * figures 4, 6, 14, 15 *; | [X] - H. E. MAUNDER ET AL, "Enhancing titres of therapeutic viral vectors using the transgene repression in vector production (TRiP) system", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20170327), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1038/ncomms14834, XP055734707 [X] 63,64,67-92 * abstract * * page 11, column 1, paragraphs 4-8 * * figures 1-4, 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms14834 | by applicant | US4797368 | US5139941 | WO9429440 | WO9609385 | WO9637623 | WO9805635 | WO9807859 | WO9809985 | WO9817815 | WO9918129 | WO9932646 | WO9941397 | US5952199 | US6100071 | WO0052188 | WO0179518 | WO03020763 | WO03064665 | US6924123 | WO2006010834 | US7056699 | WO2007071994 | WO2007072056 | WO2009153563 | WO2014043131 | WO2015092440 | EP3502260 | - GALY, A.A. J. THRASHER, Curr Opin Allergy Clin Immunol, (20100000), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 545 - 550 | - PORTER, D. L.B. L. LEVINEM. KALOSA. BAGGC. H. JUNE, N Engl J Med, (20110000), vol. 365, no. 8, pages 725 - 733 | - CAMPOCHIARO, P. A., Gene Ther, (20120000), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 121 - 126 | - CARTIER, N., S. HACEIN-BEY-ABINAC. C. BARTHOLOMAEP. BOUGNERESM. SCHMIDTC. V. KALLEA. FISCHERM. CAVAZZANA-CALVOP. AUBOURG, Methods Enzymol, (20120000), vol. 507, pages 187 - 198 | - SADELAIN, M.I. RIVIEREX. WANGF. BOULADS. PROCKOPP. GIARDINAA. MAGGIOR. GALANELLOF. LOCATELLIE. YANNAKI, Ann N Y Acad Sci, (20100000), vol. 1202, pages 52 - 58 | - DIGIUSTO, D. L.A. KRISHNANL. LIH. LIS. LIA. RAOS. MIP. YAMS. STINSONM. KALOS, Sci Transl Med, (20100000), vol. 2, no. 36, pages 36 - 43 | - MANSERVIGIET et al., Open Virol J., (20100000), vol. 4, pages 123 - 156 | - HANTZOPOULOS et al., PNAS, (19890000), vol. 86, page 3519 | - YANG MS. A., VAN LOON APGMGOLLNICK P., "Blocking ribosome access to the trpG and yhaG ribosome binding sites", Journal of Bacteriology, (19950000), vol. 177, pages 4272 - 4278 | - BABITZKE P, Y. J.CAMPANELLI D., Journal of Bacteriology, (19960000), vol. 178, no. 17, pages 5159 - 5163 | - LUND et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19840000), vol. 259, pages 2013 - 2021 | - LEWIS et al., EMBO J, (19920000), vol. 11, no. 8, pages 3053 - 3058 | - GOLLNICK, B.ANTSONYANOFSKY, Annual Review of Genetics, (20050000), vol. 39, pages 47 - 68 | - SHIMOTSU H, K. M.YANOFSKY CHENNER DJ, "Attenuation of transcription of the trpEDCFBA operon", Journal of Bacteriology, (19860000), vol. 166, pages 461 - 471 | - YAKHNIN H, B. J.YAKHNIN AVBABITZKE P., "Promotion of formation of the trpE and trpD Shine-Dalgarno blocking hairpin", Journal of Bacteriology, (20010000), vol. 183, no. 20, pages 5918 - 5926 | - ANTSON AAD. E., DODSON GGREAVES RBCHEN XGOLLNICK P., Nature, (19990000), vol. 401, no. 6750, pages 235 - 242 | - BABITZKE P, S. J.SHIRE SJYANOFSKY C., Journal of Biological Chemistry, (19940000), vol. 269, pages 16597 - 16604 | - THOMPSON, S., Trends in Microbiology, (20120000), vol. 20, no. 11, pages 558 - 566 | - DICKINS et al., Nature Genetics, (20050000), vol. 37, pages 1281 - 1288 | - RALPH et al., Nature Medicine, (20050000), vol. 11, pages 429 - 433 | - STARK et al., Annu Rev Biochem, (19980000), vol. 67, pages 227 - 64 | - ELBASHIR et al., EMBO J., (20010000), vol. 20, no. 23, pages 6877 - 88 | - HUTVAGNER et al., Science, (20010712), vol. 293, no. 5531, pages 834 - 8 | - J Virol, (20020000), vol. 76, no. 18, pages 9378 - 9388 | - WEST, S., Biochemical Society Transactions, (20120000), vol. 40, pages 846 - 849 | - KHARYTONCHYK, S., J. Mol. Biol., (20180000), vol. 430, pages 2066 - 79 | - VERMASOMIA, Nature, (19970000), vol. 389, no. 6648, pages 239 - 242 | - MARTARANO et al., J Virol, (19940000), vol. 68, no. 5, pages 3102 - 3111 | - STEWART, H. J.M. A. LEROUX-CARLUCCIC. J. SIONK. A. MITROPHANOUSP. A. RADCLIFFE, Gene Ther., (20050300), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 805 - 814 | - DERSENEWBOLD, Virology, (19930000), vol. 194, no. 2, pages 530 - 536 | - MAURY et al., Virology, (19940000), vol. 200, no. 2, pages 632 - 642 | - YU et al., PNAS, (19860000), vol. 83, pages 3194 - 98 | - MARTY et al., Biochimie, (19900000), vol. 72, pages 885 - 7 | - NAVIAUX et al., J. Virol., (19960000), vol. 70, pages 2581 - 5 | - IWAKUMA et al., Virol, (19990000), vol. 261, pages 120 - 32 | - DEGLON et al., Human Gene Therapy, (20000000), vol. 11, pages 179 - 90 | - ALLOCCA M et al., J. Clin Invest, (20080000), vol. 118, pages 1955 - 1964 | - BOWTELL et al., J.Virol., (19880000), vol. 62, page 2464 | - CORRELL et al., Blood, (19940000), vol. 84, page 1812 | - EMERMANTEMIN, Cell, (19840000), vol. 39, page 459 | - GHATTAS et al., Mol.Cell.Biol., (19910000), vol. 11, page 5848 | - HATZOGLOU et al., J.Biol.Chem, (19910000), vol. 266, page 8416 | - HATZOGLOU et al., J.Biol.Chem, (19880000), vol. 263, page 17798 | - LI et al., Hum.Gen.Ther., (19920000), vol. 3, page 381 | - MCLACHLIN et al., Virol, (19930000), vol. 195, page 1 | - OVERELL et al., Mol.Cell Biol., (19880000), vol. 8, page 1803 | - SCHARFMAN et al., PNAS, (19910000), vol. 88, page 4626 | - VILE et al., Gene Ther, (19940000), vol. 1, page 307 | - XU et al., Virol, (19890000), vol. 171, page 331 | - YEE et al., PNAS, (19870000), vol. 84, page 5197 | - ADAM et al., J.Virol., (19910000), vol. 65, page 4985 | - KOO et al., Virology, (19920000), vol. 186, pages 669 - 675 | - CHEN et al., J. Virol, (19930000), vol. 67, pages 2142 - 2148 | - JANG et al., Enzyme, (19900000), vol. 44, pages 292 - 309 | - MOUNTFORDSMITH, TIG May, (19950000), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 179 - 184 | - GHATTAS, I.R. et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., vol. 11, pages 5848 - 5859 | - MACEJAKSARNOW, Nature, (19910000), vol. 353, page 91 | - OH et al., Genes & Development, (19920000), vol. 6, pages 1643 - 1653 | - PELLETIERSONENBERG, Nature, (19880000), vol. 334, pages 320 - 325 | - MOUNTFORDSMITH, TIG, (19850000), vol. 11, pages 179 - 184 | - YAO FSVENSJO TWINKLER TLU MERIKSSON CERIKSSON E., Hum Gene Ther, (19980000), vol. 9, pages 1939 - 1950 | - MAUNDER et al., Nat Commun, (20170327), page 8 | - KAYE et al., J Virol. Oct, (19950000), vol. 69, no. 10, pages 6588 - 92 | - VALSESIA-WITTMAN et al., J Virol, (19960000), vol. 70, pages 2056 - 64 | - NILSON et al., Gene Ther, (19960000), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 280 - 286 | - FIELDING et al., Blood, (19980000), vol. 91, no. 5, pages 1802 - 1809 | - EMI et al., Journal of Virology, (19910000), vol. 65, pages 1202 - 1207 | - ABE et al., J Virol, (19980000), vol. 72, no. 8, pages 6356 - 6361 | - BURNS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 8033 - 7 | - YEE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 9564 - 9568 | - KUMAR MBRADOW BPZIMMERBERG J, Hum Gene Ther, (20030000), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 67 - 77 | - DEVEREUX et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19840000), vol. 12, page 387 | - AUSUBEL et al., ibid, (19990000), pages 7 - 58,7-60 | - ATSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), pages 403 - 410 | - FEMS Microbiol Lett, (19990000), vol. 177, no. 1, pages 187 - 50 |