Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.12.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
31.08.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
26.08.2022 | Change - classification | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
26.08.2022 | Change - classification | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
05.08.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
05.08.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
27.05.2022 | Change - classification | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
27.05.2022 | Change - classification | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
29.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.01.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
28.01.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
22.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.11.2021 | Change - representative | |
26.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.12.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |