EP3961487 - CALIBRATION METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAN, Wenxi No.18, Haibin Road Wusha, Chang' an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Biao No.18, Haibin Road Wusha, Chang' an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Thorniley, Peter, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 20814524.3 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020CN90624 | Priority number, date | CN201910459499 | 29.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910459499 | [2022/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020238656 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3961487 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V40/13, G06F3/041, G06F21/31 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP,CN,US);
G06V40/1318 (EP,US);
G06F3/041 (CN);
G06T7/97 (US);
G06V40/1353 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | G06K9/00, G06K9/20, G06F3/041, G06F21/31 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | KALIBRIERVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/09] | English: | CALIBRATION METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE | [2022/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTALONNAGE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2021 | Translation filed | 26.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 01.12.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018137337 (ZENG YANG [CN], et al) [X] 1,10,14,15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0011] - [0041] - [0059] - [0070] , [0071] , [0079] , [0083] , [0 84] , [ 0105] * [I] 2-4,6-9,11-13; | [A]US10216975 (HE YI [US], et al) [A] 1-4,6-15* column 18, line 36 - column 31, line 65 * | International search | [Y]CN109376630 (OPPO CHONGQING INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1, 10, 19, 20 * description, paragraphs 30-101 *; | [A]CN109376630 (OPPO CHONGQING INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [A] 2-9, 11-18 * description, paragraphs 30-101 *; | [Y]CN109685032 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD) [Y] 1, 10, 19, 20 * description, paragraphs 31-147 *; | [A]CN109685032 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD) [A] 2-9, 11-18 * description, paragraphs 31-147 *; | [A]CN109784268 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [PX]CN110188679 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [PX] 1-20 * entire document * |