Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11708640 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2023 | B2 | US2022341051 | 27.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | US202017618325 | 12.06.2020 | WO2020US37539 | 12.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220041073 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020US37539 | 12.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7239745B | Global Dossier | 14.03.2023 | B2 | JP2022536713 | 18.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020US37539 | 12.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114222829B | Global Dossier | 29.08.2023 | B | CN114222829 | 22.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020US37539 | 12.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3143266 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2022 | C | CA3143266 | 17.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020US37539 | 12.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020292388B | Global Dossier | 02.06.2022 | B2 | AU2020292388 | 03.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020US37539 | 12.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3984091 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2023 | A4 | EP3984091 | 20.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020US37539 | 12.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021025313 | 22.02.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020US37539 | 12.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021015478 | 24.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020US37539 | 12.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20220213 | 01.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020US37539 | 12.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA128492 | 24.07.2024 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020US37539 | 12.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA202110506 | 25.01.2023 | B | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020US37539 | 12.06.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020252343 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2021003332 | 02.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ECSP22002091 | 31.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962860928 | 13.06.2019 |