Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024129460 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217987732 | 15.11.2022 | US202318525025 | 30.11.2023 | US201962861291 | 13.06.2019 | US201962861286 | 13.06.2019 | US202117547835 | 10.12.2021 | WO2020KR07727 | 15.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11889069 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2024 | B2 | US2023119780 | 20.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217987732 | 15.11.2022 | US201962861291 | 13.06.2019 | US201962861286 | 13.06.2019 | US202117547835 | 10.12.2021 | WO2020KR07727 | 15.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11533479 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2022 | B2 | US2022174272 | 02.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962861291 | 13.06.2019 | US201962861286 | 13.06.2019 | US202117547835 | 10.12.2021 | WO2020KR07727 | 15.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210158387 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962861291 | 13.06.2019 | US201962861286 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020KR07727 | 15.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7543515B | Global Dossier | 02.09.2024 | B2 | JP2023171926 | 05.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962861291 | 13.06.2019 | US201962861286 | 13.06.2019 | JP2021573965 | 15.06.2020 | WO2020KR07727 | 15.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7362786B | Global Dossier | 17.10.2023 | B2 | JP2022536383 | 15.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962861291 | 13.06.2019 | US201962861286 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020KR07727 | 15.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114128270 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962861291 | 13.06.2019 | US201962861286 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020KR07727 | 15.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3985971 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2023 | A4 | EP3985971 | 20.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962861291 | 13.06.2019 | US201962861286 | 13.06.2019 | WO2020KR07727 | 15.06.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020251330 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962861291 | 13.06.2019 | US201962861286 | 13.06.2019 |