|
05.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2023 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.01.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.01.2023 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2023 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2022 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2022 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2022 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.06.2022 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.06.2022 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
16 |
|
25.02.2022 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.02.2022 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.02.2022 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.01.2022 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
05.01.2022 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
05.01.2022 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
15.11.2021 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.11.2021 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2021 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.11.2021 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
08.11.2021 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
04.11.2021 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.10.2021 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.10.2021 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.10.2021 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
07.10.2021 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
07.10.2021 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
07.10.2021 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.10.2021 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
07.10.2021 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.07.2021 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.07.2021 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2021 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
17.06.2021 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
17.06.2021 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
17.06.2021 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
17.06.2021 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.06.2021 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.01.2021 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.01.2021 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
06.01.2021 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
46 |
|
06.01.2021 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
06.01.2021 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |