Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023050226 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017784348 | 04.12.2020 | US201962947498 | 12.12.2019 | WO2020US63296 | 04.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220113475 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962947498 | 12.12.2019 | WO2020US63296 | 04.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023509828 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962947498 | 12.12.2019 | WO2020US63296 | 04.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL293197 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962947498 | 12.12.2019 | WO2020US63296 | 04.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114788193B | Global Dossier | 31.10.2023 | B | CN114788193 | 22.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962947498 | 12.12.2019 | WO2020US63296 | 04.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3159998 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962947498 | 12.12.2019 | WO2020US63296 | 04.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020401537 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962947498 | 12.12.2019 | WO2020US63296 | 04.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4062559 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201962947498 | 12.12.2019 | WO2020US63296 | 04.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112022011448 | 30.08.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201962947498 | 12.12.2019 | WO2020US63296 | 04.12.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021118880 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2021 | A3 | WO2021118880 | 17.06.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201962947498 | 12.12.2019 |