EP4062559 - SATELLITE COMMUNICATIONS USING SPREAD SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viasat, Inc. Patent Department 6155 El Camino Real Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WYCKOFF, Peter S. Viasat, Inc. c/o Patent Department 6155 El Camino Real Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Smith, Jeremy Robert, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20834030.7 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020US63296 | Priority number, date | US201962947498P | 12.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962947498 P | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021118880 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4062559 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185, H04B1/69, H04B7/04 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
H04B7/1851 (EP,IL);
H04B7/216 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04B7/18513 (KR,US);
H04J13/0077 (EP,IL,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | SATELLITENKOMMUNIKATION MIT SPREIZSIGNALEN | [2022/39] | English: | SATELLITE COMMUNICATIONS USING SPREAD SIGNALS | [2022/39] | French: | COMMUNICATIONS PAR SATELLITE À L'AIDE DE SIGNAUX ÉTALÉS | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 24.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0909042 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1,16,22 * paragraphs [0021] - [0050] *; | [A]WO0148944 (INST NAT RECH SCIENT [CA]) [A] 1,16,22 * pages 1,79-89 *; | [A]US2008242243 (KIKUCHI TOHRU [JP]) [A] 1,16,22* paragraphs [0061] - [0080]; figure 7 *; | [YA] - Borre Kai ET AL, "GPS signal", (2007) GPS Signal. In: A Software-Defined GPS and Galileo Receiver. Applied and Numerical Harmonic Analysis., Birkhäuser Boston., (20071231), pages 17 - 18, doi:https://doi.org/10.1007/978-0-8176-4540-3_2, ISBN 978-0-8176-4540-3, XP055787568 [Y] 1-9,12-15 * the whole document * [A] 10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/https://doi.org/10.1007/978-0-8176-4540-3_2 | [XYI] - FERNANDEZ-PRADES CARLES ET AL, "Robust GNSS Receivers by Array Signal Processing: Theory and Implementation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, vol. 104, no. 6, doi:10.1109/JPROC.2016.2532963, ISSN 0018-9219, (20160601), pages 1207 - 1220, (20160518), XP011610458 [X] 16-18,21-24 * Section III;; figure 2 * [Y] 1-9,12-15 [I] 19,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2016.2532963 |