EP3997454 - WAVEGUIDE INTEGRATION WITH OPTICAL COUPLING STRUCTURES ON LIGHT DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina, Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMADI, Arvin 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 02 /
RIVAL, Arnaud 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 03 /
ABEILLE, Fabien 46 Rue Pierre Samard 38000 Grenoble / FR | 04 /
AGAH, Ali 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 05 /
CIESLA, Craig 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 06 /
KARUNAKARAN, Aathavan 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/19] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20836183.2 | 25.06.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020US39552 | Priority number, date | US201962871596P | 08.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962871596 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021007039 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3997454 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447, G01N27/414, G01N21/64, H01L21/82, H01L27/146, G02B6/12, G01N21/05, G01N21/77, H01L27/144 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H01L27/1443 (EP,KR);
G01N21/6402 (CN,KR);
G01N21/05 (CN,KR);
G01N21/645 (US);
G01N21/6428 (CN,KR);
G01N21/648 (EP,KR);
G01N21/7703 (EP,KR);
G02B6/124 (CN,KR,US);
H01L27/14625 (EP,KR);
H01L27/14825 (US);
G01N15/1436 (US);
G01N2021/058 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2021/6432 (CN,KR);
G01N2021/6482 (CN,KR,US);
G01N2021/6484 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | G01N27/447, G01N27/414, G01N21/64, H01L21/82, H01L27/146 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | WELLENLEITERINTEGRATION MIT OPTISCHEN KOPPLUNGSSTRUKTUREN AUF LICHTDETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/19] | English: | WAVEGUIDE INTEGRATION WITH OPTICAL COUPLING STRUCTURES ON LIGHT DETECTION DEVICE | [2022/19] | French: | INTÉGRATION DE GUIDE D'ONDES AVEC DES STRUCTURES DE COUPLAGE OPTIQUE SUR UN DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE LUMIÈRE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2021 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 04.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014031157 (ILLUMINA INC [US]) [A] 1,3-5,7,10,11 * paragraphs [0052] - [0063]; figures 1-4C *; | [A]US2015131939 (TSENG CHUN-HAO [TW], et al) [A] 1,2* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-5 *; | [I]US2015376694 (MCCAFFREY NATHANIEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0092]; figures 1A,1B,5A-10 *; | [A]US2016363728 (WANG SHANG [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 5A,5B *; | [A]US9863880 (ROTHBERG JONATHAN M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 18, line 66 - column 24, line 6; figures 2-3 * | International search | [A]JP2008003061 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-23; | [Y]WO2014031157 (ILLUMINA INC [US]) [Y] 1-23; | [Y]US2015376694 (MCCAFFREY NATHANIEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 1-23; | [A]US2016341656 (LIU YI-SHAO [TW], et al) [A] 1-23; | [A]WO2018200300 (ILLUMINA INC [US])[A] 1-23 |