EP3996695 - CANNABIDIOL ORALLY DISINTEGRATING TABLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tenshi Kaizen Private Limited Plot No 46, 1st Phase, KIADB Industrial Area Harohalli, Kanakapura Bangalore, Bangalore Rural, Karnataka 562112 / IN | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Vinod Reddy Bondu 18-8-3G/404, Madhura Nagar Seshadri Towers Tirupati Chittoor (Dist), Andhra Pradesh 517501 / IN | 02 /
IYER, Chamarahalli Krishna Sundhar 167, 4th Main, Judicial Layout, Thalagattapura Kanakapura Main Road Bangalore 560062 / IN | 03 /
IYER, Venkat L204 Mantri Woodlands, Arekere Gate, Bg Road Banglore 560076 / IN | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20852804.2 | 12.08.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020IN50705 | Priority number, date | IN201941032533 | 12.08.2019 Original published format: IN201941032533 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021028943 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3996695 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/05, A61K31/352, A61K47/36, A61K47/26, A61K47/38, A61K47/40, A61K9/20, A61K9/19 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
A61K9/19 (EP);
A61K9/0056 (EP,AU,US);
A61K31/047 (US);
A61K31/05 (EP,AU);
A61K31/352 (EP);
A61K47/14 (AU);
A61K47/36 (AU);
A61K47/38 (AU);
A61K47/40 (AU);
A61K9/006 (EP,AU);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61K9/2013 (US);
A61K9/2018 (US);
A61K9/205 (EP);
A61K9/2054 (US);
A61K9/2059 (US);
A61K9/2095 (EP,US);
B65B11/52 (US);
B65B55/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | A61K31/05, A61K31/352, A61K47/36, A61K47/26, A61K47/38, A61K47/40, A61K9/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | IM MUND ZERFALLENDE CANNABIDIOL-TABLETTEN | [2022/19] | English: | CANNABIDIOL ORALLY DISINTEGRATING TABLETS | [2022/19] | French: | COMPRIMÉS DE CANNABIDIOL À DÉSINTÉGRATION ORALE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 12.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4758598 (GREGORY GEORGE K E [GB]); | [A]US2005153931 (JARHO PEKKA [FI], et al); | [XY]US2016058866 (SEKURA RONALD D [US], et al); | [XP]WO2020035850 (YISSUM RES DEV CO OF HEBREW UNIV JERUSALEM LTD [IL], et al) | International search | [XA]US4758598 (GREGORY GEORGE K E [GB]); | [A]US4946684 (BLANK ROBERT G [US], et al); | [A]US6010719 (REMON JEAN PAUL [BE], et al); | [A]US2004156895 (PRUITT JOHN D [US], et al); | [XA]AU2002231970B (GW RES LTD [GB]); | [XA]EP1938803 (ELAN PHARMA INT LTD [IE]); | [A]US2014178473 (LIM CHIN BENG STEPHEN [AU], et al); | [XA]US2016058866 (SEKURA RONALD D [US], et al); | [XA]WO2018205017 (INTELGENX CORP [CA]) |