Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.04.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
04.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
09.12.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
09.12.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
13.10.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] |
07.10.2022 | Change - classification | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] |
07.10.2022 | Change - classification | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] |
19.08.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.07.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
15.07.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
11.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.05.2022 | Change - representative | |
02.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.04.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.04.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |