Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022341014 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP36379 | 25.09.2020 | JP2019182231 | 02.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220073804 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP36379 | 25.09.2020 | JP2019182231 | 02.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7268182B | Global Dossier | 02.05.2023 | B2 | JPWO2021065738 | 08.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP36379 | 25.09.2020 | JP2019182231 | 02.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114502760B | Global Dossier | 28.03.2023 | B | CN114502760 | 13.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP36379 | 25.09.2020 | JP2019182231 | 02.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4043597 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2022 | A4 | EP4043597 | 17.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP36379 | 25.09.2020 | JP2019182231 | 02.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022003956 | 25.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP36379 | 25.09.2020 | JP2019182231 | 02.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021065738 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019182231 | 02.10.2019 |