Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
23.02.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
05.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.12.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] |
23.12.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] |
31.08.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.07.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
22.07.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
27.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
11.05.2022 | Change - representative | |
11.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.04.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
10.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.04.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.04.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |