Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022255194 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020AU51112 | 16.10.2020 | AU2019903898 | 16.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220127809 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020AU51112 | 16.10.2020 | AU2019903898 | 16.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023512859 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020AU51112 | 16.10.2020 | AU2019903898 | 16.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114902465 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020AU51112 | 16.10.2020 | AU2019903898 | 16.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3154830 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020AU51112 | 16.10.2020 | AU2019903898 | 16.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020367536 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020AU51112 | 16.10.2020 | AU2019903898 | 16.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4046230 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2024 | A4 | EP4046230 | 24.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020AU51112 | 16.10.2020 | AU2019903898 | 16.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021072497 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2019903898 | 16.10.2019 |