Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4046264 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2023 | A4 | EP4046264 | 24.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US56303 | 19.10.2020 | US201962923343 | 18.10.2019 | US202016801746 | 26.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021077076 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962923343 | 18.10.2019 | US202016801746 | 26.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11342911 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2022 | B2 | US2021119627 | 22.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962923343 | 18.10.2019 | US202016801746 | 26.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112688677 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962923343 | 18.10.2019 | US202016801746 | 26.02.2020 |