Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.04.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
06.01.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
06.01.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
17.12.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
16.12.2022 | First examination report | |
07.12.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
02.12.2022 | Change - classification | published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
02.12.2022 | Change - classification | published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
30.11.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
26.10.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.08.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
05.08.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
11.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.04.2022 | Change - representative | |
30.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.11.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
08.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.05.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |